THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:41:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 404 - 111 Main Street West
North Bay Ontario P1B 2T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-476-7400
Fax: 705-476-2585

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathryn Shaw Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shaw (CPSO#: 106567 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
(705) 474-8600
Business Address: Bue Sky Family Health Team
111 Main Street West
Suite 404
North Bay Ontario P1B 2T6
(705) 476-7400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 404 - 111 Main Street West
North Bay Ontario P1B 2T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-476-7400
Fax: 705-476-2585

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathryn Shaw Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shaw (CPSO#: 106567 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
(705) 474-8600
Business Address: Bue Sky Family Health Team
111 Main Street West
Suite 404
North Bay Ontario P1B 2T6
(705) 476-7400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN KRISTINE SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN KRISTINE SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015