THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:38:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Elm Street
Unit 275
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3C 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055863601
Fax: 7055863602

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury Sudbury
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James G. Callaghan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Callaghan (CPSO#: 106573 )
Business Address: 885 Prete Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3X9
(705) 586-3601

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Elm Street
Unit 275
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3C 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055863601
Fax: 7055863602

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury Sudbury
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James G. Callaghan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Callaghan (CPSO#: 106573 )
Business Address: 885 Prete Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3X9
(705) 586-3601

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES GABRIEL JOSEPH CALLAGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALLAGHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES GABRIEL JOSEPH CALLAGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALLAGHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015