THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:06:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
East Wing 6-411
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5317
Fax: (416) 603-5333
Address: 2201 Bristol Cir
Suite 100 and 200
Oakville ON L6H 0J8
Phone: (905) 456-3937
Fax: (905) 820-0111
Address: 600-340 College St
Toronto ON M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-2132
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600-340 College St
Kensington Eye Institute
Toronto ON M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-2132
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I N Kherani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Kherani (CPSO#: 106580 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
East Wing 6-411
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
416-603-5317

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
East Wing 6-411
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5317
Fax: (416) 603-5333
Address: 2201 Bristol Cir
Suite 100 and 200
Oakville ON L6H 0J8
Phone: (905) 456-3937
Fax: (905) 820-0111
Address: 600-340 College St
Toronto ON M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-2132
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600-340 College St
Kensington Eye Institute
Toronto ON M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-2132
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I N Kherani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Kherani (CPSO#: 106580 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
East Wing 6-411
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
416-603-5317

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRFAN NIZARALI KHERANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHERANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRFAN NIZARALI KHERANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHERANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015