THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:04:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 14 Apr 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 14 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MARK CARSON ROCKLEY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rockley (CPSO#: 106582 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Room A280
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 14 Apr 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 14 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MARK CARSON ROCKLEY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rockley (CPSO#: 106582 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Room A280
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK CARSON ROCKLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCKLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK CARSON ROCKLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCKLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 May 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015