THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 08:35:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Hand & Wrist Clinic
Division of Plastic & Reconstuctive Surgery
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166035802
Fax: 4166035392

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 20 Apr 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin J. Zuo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zuo (CPSO#: 106597 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
East Wing 2nd Floor
Room 424
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
4166035802

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Hand & Wrist Clinic
Division of Plastic & Reconstuctive Surgery
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166035802
Fax: 4166035392

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 20 Apr 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin J. Zuo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zuo (CPSO#: 106597 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
East Wing 2nd Floor
Room 424
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
4166035802

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN JIAJUN ZUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN JIAJUN ZUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015