THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:27:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: West China Medical University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre for
Addiction and Mental Health
Geriatric Outpatient Program
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)535 8501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3660 Midland Avenue
Unit 103
Scarborough Ontario M1V 0B8
Phone: 4162913883
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Scottfield Dr
Scarborough ON M1S 5T7
Phone: 416 3210777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Li Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chu (CPSO#: 106602 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
3660 Midland Avenue
Suite 103
Toronto Ontario M1V 0B8
(416) 291-3883
Business Address: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Geriatric Outpatient Program
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: West China Medical University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre for
Addiction and Mental Health
Geriatric Outpatient Program
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)535 8501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3660 Midland Avenue
Unit 103
Scarborough Ontario M1V 0B8
Phone: 4162913883
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Scottfield Dr
Scarborough ON M1S 5T7
Phone: 416 3210777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Li Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chu (CPSO#: 106602 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
3660 Midland Avenue
Suite 103
Toronto Ontario M1V 0B8
(416) 291-3883
Business Address: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Geriatric Outpatient Program
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LI CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LI CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: West China Medical University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2015