THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:12:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre Francophone de Toronto
303 - 555 Richmond St W
Toronto Ontario M5V 3B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 922-2672
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Raza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Raza (CPSO#: 106640 )
Business Address: 303-600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
(416) 922-0840
Business Address: Suite 303
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
(416) 922-0840

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre Francophone de Toronto
303 - 555 Richmond St W
Toronto Ontario M5V 3B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 922-2672
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Raza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Raza (CPSO#: 106640 )
Business Address: 303-600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
(416) 922-0840
Business Address: Suite 303
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
(416) 922-0840

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYESHA RAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYESHA RAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015