THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-150 Huron St
Stratford ON N5A 5S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-305-1223
Fax: 226-633-5900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Rodowa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rodowa (CPSO#: 106647 )
Business Address: 1-150 Huron Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5S8
519-305-1223

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-150 Huron St
Stratford ON N5A 5S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-305-1223
Fax: 226-633-5900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Rodowa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rodowa (CPSO#: 106647 )
Business Address: 1-150 Huron Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5S8
519-305-1223

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELINDA-SUE RODOWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODOWA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELINDA-SUE RODOWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODOWA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015