THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:40:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5425 Creditview Road
Streetsville Medical Center
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 826 1164
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1500-333 Bay St
Toronto ON M5H 2R2
Phone: 416-364-3008
Fax: 416-362-2018

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Azra Premji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Premji (CPSO#: 106655 )
Business Address: 400 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
(905) 366-0053
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: Streetsville Medical Centre
8 - 5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
(905) 826-1164

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5425 Creditview Road
Streetsville Medical Center
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 826 1164
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1500-333 Bay St
Toronto ON M5H 2R2
Phone: 416-364-3008
Fax: 416-362-2018

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Azra Premji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Premji (CPSO#: 106655 )
Business Address: 400 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
(905) 366-0053
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: Streetsville Medical Centre
8 - 5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
(905) 826-1164

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AZRA PREMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREMJI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AZRA PREMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREMJI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015