THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:24:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058487100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 301-755 Queensway E
Trillium Spine Center
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5
Phone: 9052793533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ROBERT POWER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Power (CPSO#: 106669 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Address: 301-755 Queensway East
Trillium Spine Center
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 4C5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058487100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 301-755 Queensway E
Trillium Spine Center
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5
Phone: 9052793533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ROBERT POWER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Power (CPSO#: 106669 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Address: 301-755 Queensway East
Trillium Spine Center
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 4C5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT GEORGE POWER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT GEORGE POWER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015