THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:50:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164806100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Nov 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lauren Riggin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Riggin (CPSO#: 106675 )
Business Address: CAMH
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
416-535-8501
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164806100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Nov 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lauren Riggin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Riggin (CPSO#: 106675 )
Business Address: CAMH
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
416-535-8501
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN SIOBHAN RIGGIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIGGIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN SIOBHAN RIGGIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIGGIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015