THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:09:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-361 Main St E
Hawkesbury ON K6A 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136320605
Fax: 6136327073
Address: 101-361 Main St E
Hawkesbury ON K6A 1A8
Phone: 613-632-0605
Fax: 613-632-7073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc-Antoine Roy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roy (CPSO#: 106686 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-361 Main St E
Hawkesbury ON K6A 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136320605
Fax: 6136327073
Address: 101-361 Main St E
Hawkesbury ON K6A 1A8
Phone: 613-632-0605
Fax: 613-632-7073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc-Antoine Roy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roy (CPSO#: 106686 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC-ANTOINE ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC-ANTOINE ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015