THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:40:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Health
89 Norman St
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rushika Perera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Perera (CPSO#: 106698 )
Business Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Health
89 Norman St
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rushika Perera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Perera (CPSO#: 106698 )
Business Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSHIKA MAYESHI PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSHIKA MAYESHI PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015