THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:19:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 302-1105 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-226-8993
Fax: 613-226-6350

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ALFRED BASILIOUS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Basilious (CPSO#: 106699 )
Business Address: 302-1105 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G5
613-226-8993
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Business Address: 1-5597 Hazeldean Rd
Stittsville ON K2S 0P5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 302-1105 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-226-8993
Fax: 613-226-6350

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ALFRED BASILIOUS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Basilious (CPSO#: 106699 )
Business Address: 302-1105 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G5
613-226-8993
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Business Address: 1-5597 Hazeldean Rd
Stittsville ON K2S 0P5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALFRED BASILIOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASILIOUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALFRED BASILIOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASILIOUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015