THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:22:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Network
General Hospital
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Dr
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Ct
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa ON L1G 8A2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Hospital
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Hospital
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blair Bigham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bigham (CPSO#: 106703 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Network
General Hospital
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Dr
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Ct
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa ON L1G 8A2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Hospital
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Hospital
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blair Bigham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bigham (CPSO#: 106703 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BLAIR LLEWELLYN BIGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIGHAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BLAIR LLEWELLYN BIGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIGHAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015