THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:14:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Emmett Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6472433600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: West Park Healthcare
82 Buttonwood Ave
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J5
Phone: 416-243-3600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Providence Healthcare
3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1L 1W1
Phone: (416) 285-3666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: West Park Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Pat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pat (CPSO#: 106715 )
Business Address: 170 Emmett Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J5
Business Address: 3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1L 1W1
Business Address: 82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Emmett Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6472433600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: West Park Healthcare
82 Buttonwood Ave
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J5
Phone: 416-243-3600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Providence Healthcare
3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1L 1W1
Phone: (416) 285-3666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: West Park Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Pat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pat (CPSO#: 106715 )
Business Address: 170 Emmett Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J5
Business Address: 3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1L 1W1
Business Address: 82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARNOLD CHEUK WANG PAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARNOLD CHEUK WANG PAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015