THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 08:50:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 Regina Street South
3rd Floor
Waterloo Ontario N2J 4V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 575-4400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 850 King St E
Hamilton ON L8M 1B4
Phone: 905-526-7137
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alim Nagji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nagji (CPSO#: 54339 ) Dr. A. Nagji (CPSO#: 105702 ) Dr. R. Bana (CPSO#: 106724 )
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: Grand River Hospital Emergency Department
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 742-3611
Business Address: St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311
Business Address: St Joseph Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 Regina Street South
3rd Floor
Waterloo Ontario N2J 4V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 575-4400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 850 King St E
Hamilton ON L8M 1B4
Phone: 905-526-7137
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alim Nagji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nagji (CPSO#: 54339 ) Dr. A. Nagji (CPSO#: 105702 ) Dr. R. Bana (CPSO#: 106724 )
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: Grand River Hospital Emergency Department
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 742-3611
Business Address: St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311
Business Address: St Joseph Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RABIA RAZI BANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RABIA RAZI BANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015