THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:18:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Don Bumstead & Family Medical Centr
#3 206106 Hwy 26
Meaford Ontario
N4L1L9
Meaford Ontario N4L 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 662-1201
Fax: (226) 662-1204

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellingsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ellingsen (CPSO#: 106725 )
Business Address: 229 Nelson Street West
Meaford Ontario N4L 1A3
(519) 538-1311
Business Address: Don Bumstead & Family Medical Centre
3 - 730 Sykes Street North
Meaford Ontario N4L 1L9
(226) 662-1201

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Don Bumstead & Family Medical Centr
#3 206106 Hwy 26
Meaford Ontario
N4L1L9
Meaford Ontario N4L 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 662-1201
Fax: (226) 662-1204

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellingsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ellingsen (CPSO#: 106725 )
Business Address: 229 Nelson Street West
Meaford Ontario N4L 1A3
(519) 538-1311
Business Address: Don Bumstead & Family Medical Centre
3 - 730 Sykes Street North
Meaford Ontario N4L 1L9
(226) 662-1201

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THORVALD CARL JOSEPH ELLINGSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLINGSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THORVALD CARL JOSEPH ELLINGSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLINGSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015