THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:22:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Neurology (Epilepsy) Clinic
5th Floor, West Wing
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5800
Extension: 3232
Fax: 416-603-5768

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 May 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JULIEN HÉBERT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hébert (CPSO#: 106734 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Office 436
5th floor, West Wing
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
4166035800 Extn: 3232

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Neurology (Epilepsy) Clinic
5th Floor, West Wing
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5800
Extension: 3232
Fax: 416-603-5768

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 May 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JULIEN HÉBERT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hébert (CPSO#: 106734 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Office 436
5th floor, West Wing
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
4166035800 Extn: 3232

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIEN HÉBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HÉBERT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIEN HÉBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HÉBERT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Apr 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015