THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:57:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Perth & Smiths Falls District Hosp.
Emergency Dept., Smiths Falls Site
60 Cornelia St. West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 2007
2675 Concession Rd
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Phone: 613-258-6133
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 108-152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 5X2
Phone: Phone: 613-627-0795
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 104-1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Phone: 613-691-2578
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester ON K0C 2K0
Phone: 613-774-2420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annelise Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Miller (CPSO#: 106743 )
Business Address: 60 Cornelia St W
Smiths Falls ON K7A 2H9
613-283-2330

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Perth & Smiths Falls District Hosp.
Emergency Dept., Smiths Falls Site
60 Cornelia St. West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 2007
2675 Concession Rd
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Phone: 613-258-6133
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 108-152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 5X2
Phone: Phone: 613-627-0795
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 104-1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Phone: 613-691-2578
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester ON K0C 2K0
Phone: 613-774-2420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annelise Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Miller (CPSO#: 106743 )
Business Address: 60 Cornelia St W
Smiths Falls ON K7A 2H9
613-283-2330

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNELISE MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNELISE MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015