THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:25:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 182
Murillo ON P0T 2G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bates Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bates (CPSO#: 106747 )
Business Address: PO Box 182
5-4565 Oliver rd
Murillo ON P0T 2G0
8072513869

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 182
Murillo ON P0T 2G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bates Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bates (CPSO#: 106747 )
Business Address: PO Box 182
5-4565 Oliver rd
Murillo ON P0T 2G0
8072513869

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT BATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT BATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015