THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:46:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Meno Ya Win
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8077373030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 21 Sylvan street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
Phone: 807 4689161
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 May 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janine Pintar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pintar (CPSO#: 106749 )
Business Address: 125 Hogan Road
Nipigon Ontario P0T 2J0
(807) 887-5252

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Meno Ya Win
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8077373030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 21 Sylvan street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
Phone: 807 4689161
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 May 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janine Pintar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pintar (CPSO#: 106749 )
Business Address: 125 Hogan Road
Nipigon Ontario P0T 2J0
(807) 887-5252

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANINE REBECCA PINTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANINE REBECCA PINTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 May 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 May 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015