THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:07:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: (416) 572-8702
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heidix K. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lam (CPSO#: 106753 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: (416) 572-8702
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heidix K. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lam (CPSO#: 106753 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEIDIX KIM HING LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEIDIX KIM HING LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015