THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:58:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 38 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Internal Medicine
Medical Administration Office
Markham ON L3P 2L8
Phone: 9054727373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shabbir Mewa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mewa (CPSO#: 106758 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 38 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Internal Medicine
Medical Administration Office
Markham ON L3P 2L8
Phone: 9054727373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shabbir Mewa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mewa (CPSO#: 106758 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHABBIR AMIRUDIN A MEWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEWA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHABBIR AMIRUDIN A MEWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEWA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015