THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4189554027
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Parkshore Drive
Brampton Ontario L6T 5M1
Phone: 1 888-236-6283
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mirette Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hanna (CPSO#: 106760 )
Business Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Business Address: 2003-25 Carlton St
Toronto ON M5B 1L4
4189554027

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4189554027
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Parkshore Drive
Brampton Ontario L6T 5M1
Phone: 1 888-236-6283
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mirette Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hanna (CPSO#: 106760 )
Business Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Business Address: 2003-25 Carlton St
Toronto ON M5B 1L4
4189554027

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRETTE HAZEM HALIM HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRETTE HAZEM HALIM HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015