THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:32:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Victoria Hospital-LHSC
E2-004
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 56927
Fax: 519-685-8076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 08 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Nayak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nayak (CPSO#: 106784 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
E2-004
London ON N6A 5W9
519-685=8500 Extn: 56927
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Suite E2-124
Victoria Hospital - LHSC
London ON N6A 5W9
5196676835

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Victoria Hospital-LHSC
E2-004
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 56927
Fax: 519-685-8076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 08 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Nayak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nayak (CPSO#: 106784 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
E2-004
London ON N6A 5W9
519-685=8500 Extn: 56927
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Suite E2-124
Victoria Hospital - LHSC
London ON N6A 5W9
5196676835

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAHUL NAYAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAHUL NAYAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Aug 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015