THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 622 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474831502
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Humber College Blvd
Suite 722
Pediatrics @ Humber College
Toronto Ontario M9V 0A9
Phone: 4167436063
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Cardiology
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 622 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474831502
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Humber College Blvd
Suite 722
Pediatrics @ Humber College
Toronto Ontario M9V 0A9
Phone: 4167436063
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Cardiology
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN PETER WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN PETER WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015