THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 23:59:05 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Ramsey Lake Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesiology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 662-7135
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 22 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cassandra Michelle Falk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Falk (CPSO#: 106788 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
7056627135

Corporation Name: Cassandra Michelle Falk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Aug 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Ramsey Lake Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesiology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 662-7135
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 22 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cassandra Michelle Falk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Falk (CPSO#: 106788 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
7056627135

Corporation Name: Cassandra Michelle Falk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Aug 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CASSANDRA MICHELLE FALK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CASSANDRA MICHELLE FALK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015