THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:52:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-597-3422
Extension: 3418
Fax: 416-597-7074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. McKyla McIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McIntyre (CPSO#: 106802 )
Business Address: 550 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
416-597-3422 Extn: 3418

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-597-3422
Extension: 3418
Fax: 416-597-7074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. McKyla McIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McIntyre (CPSO#: 106802 )
Business Address: 550 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
416-597-3422 Extn: 3418

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MCKYLA HERA MCINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTYRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MCKYLA HERA MCINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTYRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015