THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:43:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Queen St W
Crisis and Critical Care Building/ Rm 6404
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-535-8501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ken Little Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Little (CPSO#: 106806 )
Business Address: 1051 QUEEN STREET W
Rm 6404
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Queen St W
Crisis and Critical Care Building/ Rm 6404
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-535-8501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ken Little Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Little (CPSO#: 106806 )
Business Address: 1051 QUEEN STREET W
Rm 6404
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEN Q LITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEN Q LITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 May 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 May 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015