THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:26:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A-3710 Nafziger Rd
Wellesley ON N0B 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-779-8409
Fax: 226-779-4209
Address: 25 Joseph St
Kitchener ON N2G 4X6
Phone: 519-578-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. CLARKE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Clarke (CPSO#: 106845 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A-3710 Nafziger Rd
Wellesley ON N0B 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-779-8409
Fax: 226-779-4209
Address: 25 Joseph St
Kitchener ON N2G 4X6
Phone: 519-578-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. CLARKE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Clarke (CPSO#: 106845 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FIONA MAY CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FIONA MAY CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015