THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:52:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2937 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 553-0305
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Lorena Barra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Demettino Castro Rocha Barra (CPSO#: 106850 )
Business Address: 99 Eagle Rock Way
unit 317
Vaughan Ontario L6A 5A7
(416) 723-2938

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2937 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 553-0305
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Lorena Barra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Demettino Castro Rocha Barra (CPSO#: 106850 )
Business Address: 99 Eagle Rock Way
unit 317
Vaughan Ontario L6A 5A7
(416) 723-2938

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORENA DEMETTINO CASTRO ROCHA BARRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMETTINO CASTRO ROCHA BARRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORENA DEMETTINO CASTRO ROCHA BARRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMETTINO CASTRO ROCHA BARRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015