THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Elliot Street Clinic
12 Elliot Street
Perth Ontario K7H 3A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132671660
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Simpson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Simpson (CPSO#: 106882 ) Dr. A. Bradi (CPSO#: 100306 )
Business Address: 12 Elliott St
Perth ON K7H 3A3
613 267 1660

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Elliot Street Clinic
12 Elliot Street
Perth Ontario K7H 3A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132671660
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Simpson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Simpson (CPSO#: 106882 ) Dr. A. Bradi (CPSO#: 100306 )
Business Address: 12 Elliott St
Perth ON K7H 3A3
613 267 1660

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES SIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMPSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES SIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMPSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015