THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:40:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 707 Charlotte St
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-4540
Fax: (705) 743-1449
Address: 170 Simcoe Ste
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2H7
Phone: 705-741-1191
Fax: 705-741-1192

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chloe Corbeil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Corbeil (CPSO#: 106884 )
Business Address: 170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2H7
(705) 741-1191
Business Address: 707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
(705) 876-4540

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 707 Charlotte St
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-4540
Fax: (705) 743-1449
Address: 170 Simcoe Ste
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2H7
Phone: 705-741-1191
Fax: 705-741-1192

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chloe Corbeil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Corbeil (CPSO#: 106884 )
Business Address: 170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2H7
(705) 741-1191
Business Address: 707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
(705) 876-4540

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHLOE ELIZABETH CORBEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORBEIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHLOE ELIZABETH CORBEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORBEIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015