THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:46:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, THAI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Good Doctors Medical Clinics
B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (888) 930-6571
Fax: (855) 967-2945

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Srichaikul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Srichaikul (CPSO#: 106885 )
Business Address: 799 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1L8
Business Address: Unit 2
2956 Highway 69N
Val Caron Ontario P3N 1E3
Business Address: 1000 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 3A8
Business Address: Patient Networks Family Medicine
Walk In Clinic
157 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5C 1X7
(416) 362-8822

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, THAI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Good Doctors Medical Clinics
B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (888) 930-6571
Fax: (855) 967-2945

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Srichaikul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Srichaikul (CPSO#: 106885 )
Business Address: 799 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1L8
Business Address: Unit 2
2956 Highway 69N
Val Caron Ontario P3N 1E3
Business Address: 1000 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 3A8
Business Address: Patient Networks Family Medicine
Walk In Clinic
157 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5C 1X7
(416) 362-8822

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KORBUA SRICHAIKUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRICHAIKUL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KORBUA SRICHAIKUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRICHAIKUL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015