THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 06:22:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Grosvenor Street
Room B3-115
St. Joseph's Health Care London
London ON N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Extension: 66288
Fax: (519) 646-6404
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Respirology, Department of Medicine
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519)685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Science Centre
Division of Respirology, Department of Medicine
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339-291 Windermere Rd
University Hospital - London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Respirology, Department of Medicine
London ON N6G 2J9
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DUROCHER & SERAJEDDINI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Serajeddini (CPSO#: 106886 ) Dr. D. Durocher (CPSO#: 103511 )
Business Address: 339-291 Windermere Rd
University Hospital
London ON N6G 2J9
5196858500 Extn: 34990

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Grosvenor Street
Room B3-115
St. Joseph's Health Care London
London ON N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Extension: 66288
Fax: (519) 646-6404
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Respirology, Department of Medicine
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519)685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Science Centre
Division of Respirology, Department of Medicine
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339-291 Windermere Rd
University Hospital - London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Respirology, Department of Medicine
London ON N6G 2J9
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DUROCHER & SERAJEDDINI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Serajeddini (CPSO#: 106886 ) Dr. D. Durocher (CPSO#: 103511 )
Business Address: 339-291 Windermere Rd
University Hospital
London ON N6G 2J9
5196858500 Extn: 34990

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANA SERAJEDDINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SERAJEDDINI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANA SERAJEDDINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SERAJEDDINI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015