THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:44:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-1425 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 7T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 478-2402
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sivachandran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sivachandran (CPSO#: 106904 )
Business Address: 5-1425 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 7T5
(647) 478-2402

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-1425 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 7T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 478-2402
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sivachandran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sivachandran (CPSO#: 106904 )
Business Address: 5-1425 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 7T5
(647) 478-2402

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIROJINI SIVACHANDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVACHANDRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIROJINI SIVACHANDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVACHANDRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015