THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:43:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 755 Queensway E
Suite 304
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 826 4048
Fax: 905 826 7201

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhupinder Sahota Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sahota (CPSO#: 106909 )
Business Address: 755 Queensway E
Suite 304
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 755 Queensway E
Suite 304
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 826 4048
Fax: 905 826 7201

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhupinder Sahota Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sahota (CPSO#: 106909 )
Business Address: 755 Queensway E
Suite 304
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BHUPINDER SINGH SAHOTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHOTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BHUPINDER SINGH SAHOTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHOTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 29 Aug 2018
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Bhupinder Sahota was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Impaired operation of a motor vehicle, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

DATE: July 26, 2018
SENTENCE: 12 months driving prohibition; Fine of $1400; Victim Surcharge of $420. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 29 Aug 2018
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Bhupinder Sahota was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Impaired operation of a motor vehicle, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

DATE: July 26, 2018
SENTENCE: 12 months driving prohibition; Fine of $1400; Victim Surcharge of $420. 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015