THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:04:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mississauga Hospital- THP
Clinical Administration - 3rd Floor
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 848 7100
Extension: 3276
Fax: 905 804 7975
Address: Etobicoke Urgent Care Centre
25 Woodbine Downs Blvd #10
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6N5
Phone: (416) 741-2273
Fax: (416) 741-3542
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Reactivation Care Centre
Humber Church
200 Church St.
Toronto Ontario M9N 1N8
Phone: 416 243 4201
Fax: 416 243 4240

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdul Shakur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shakur (CPSO#: 106917 )
Business Address: 200 Church Street
Toronto Ontario M9N 1N8
(416) 243-4201
Business Address: Etobicoke Urgent Care Centre
10 - 25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6N5
(416) 741-2273
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100 Extn: 3276

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mississauga Hospital- THP
Clinical Administration - 3rd Floor
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 848 7100
Extension: 3276
Fax: 905 804 7975
Address: Etobicoke Urgent Care Centre
25 Woodbine Downs Blvd #10
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6N5
Phone: (416) 741-2273
Fax: (416) 741-3542
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Reactivation Care Centre
Humber Church
200 Church St.
Toronto Ontario M9N 1N8
Phone: 416 243 4201
Fax: 416 243 4240

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdul Shakur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shakur (CPSO#: 106917 )
Business Address: 200 Church Street
Toronto Ontario M9N 1N8
(416) 243-4201
Business Address: Etobicoke Urgent Care Centre
10 - 25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6N5
(416) 741-2273
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100 Extn: 3276

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDUL YASEER SHAKUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAKUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDUL YASEER SHAKUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAKUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015