THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:35:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 123 Marks St
Atikokan Ontario P0T 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 597-2721
Fax: (807) 597-4632

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Rainy River

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nelson Lyon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lyon (CPSO#: 106920 )
Business Address: 120 Dorothy Street
Rainy River Ontario P0T 1C0
(807) 597-4215
Business Address: 123 Marks Street
Atikokan Ontario P0T 1C0
(807) 597-2721

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 123 Marks St
Atikokan Ontario P0T 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 597-2721
Fax: (807) 597-4632

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Rainy River

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nelson Lyon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lyon (CPSO#: 106920 )
Business Address: 120 Dorothy Street
Rainy River Ontario P0T 1C0
(807) 597-4215
Business Address: 123 Marks Street
Atikokan Ontario P0T 1C0
(807) 597-2721

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NELSON CAMPBELL LYON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NELSON CAMPBELL LYON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015