THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:42:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oaklawn Center
Unit 1
1401 Plains Rd E
Burlington Ontario L7R 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-8777
Fax: (905) 632-8555
Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Phone: 905-632-3737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Aug 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jul 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sadeq Al-Sarraf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al-Sarraf (CPSO#: 106925 )
Business Address: 1-1401 Plains Rd E
Burlington ON L7R 0C2
Business Address: 245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oaklawn Center
Unit 1
1401 Plains Rd E
Burlington Ontario L7R 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-8777
Fax: (905) 632-8555
Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Phone: 905-632-3737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Aug 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jul 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sadeq Al-Sarraf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al-Sarraf (CPSO#: 106925 )
Business Address: 1-1401 Plains Rd E
Burlington ON L7R 0C2
Business Address: 245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Aug 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 01 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sadeq Al-Sarraf may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and child
and adolescent psychiatry.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sadeq Al-Sarraf may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and child
and adolescent psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Oct 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015