THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:21:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Markham Rd
Unit 523
Scarborough ON M1H 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164392335
Extension: 1
Fax: 4164793684

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Merihan Abdelmalek Medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdelmalek (CPSO#: 106928 )
Business Address: 523-1200 Markham Rd
medical office
suite 523
Scarborough ON M1H 3C3
4164392335

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Markham Rd
Unit 523
Scarborough ON M1H 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164392335
Extension: 1
Fax: 4164793684

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Merihan Abdelmalek Medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdelmalek (CPSO#: 106928 )
Business Address: 523-1200 Markham Rd
medical office
suite 523
Scarborough ON M1H 3C3
4164392335

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERIHAN ZARIF RIAD ABDELMALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELMALEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERIHAN ZARIF RIAD ABDELMALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELMALEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015