THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:03:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 304
4789 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 0G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 221-8612
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.Z. Tao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tao (CPSO#: 106969 )
Business Address: 4789 Yonge Street
Suite 304
Toronto Ontario M2N 0G3
(416) 221-8612

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 304
4789 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 0G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 221-8612
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.Z. Tao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tao (CPSO#: 106969 )
Business Address: 4789 Yonge Street
Suite 304
Toronto Ontario M2N 0G3
(416) 221-8612

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REN ZHU TAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REN ZHU TAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015