THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:37:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Louis University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Micro Court
Unit 101, Skin Lesion Clinic
Downtown clinic available for skin
cancer/growth only (skinlesion.ca)
Markham Ontario L3R 9Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 499-2899
Fax: 416-479-3948
Address: 15 Wellesley Street West
Unit 316, Skin Lesion Clinic
Only accepts skin cancer/growth
Pls refer other issues to 80 Micro
Toronto Ontario M4Y 0G7
Phone: (437) 340-4343
Fax: 416-987-5583

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.Y. Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wang (CPSO#: 107009 )
Business Address: 7398 Yonge Street
Vaughan Ontario L4J 8J2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: St. Louis University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Micro Court
Unit 101, Skin Lesion Clinic
Downtown clinic available for skin
cancer/growth only (skinlesion.ca)
Markham Ontario L3R 9Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 499-2899
Fax: 416-479-3948
Address: 15 Wellesley Street West
Unit 316, Skin Lesion Clinic
Only accepts skin cancer/growth
Pls refer other issues to 80 Micro
Toronto Ontario M4Y 0G7
Phone: (437) 340-4343
Fax: 416-987-5583

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.Y. Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wang (CPSO#: 107009 )
Business Address: 7398 Yonge Street
Vaughan Ontario L4J 8J2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANG YE WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANG YE WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Louis University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015