THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 05:09:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession St
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zonia Ghumman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Ghumman (CPSO#: 107015 )
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3

Corporation Name: Dr. Zonia Ghumman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Dec 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession St
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zonia Ghumman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Ghumman (CPSO#: 107015 )
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3

Corporation Name: Dr. Zonia Ghumman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Dec 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZONIA GHUMMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHUMMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZONIA GHUMMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHUMMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015