THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:32:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Charlton Campus
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Gerard Galvin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Galvin (CPSO#: 107016 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Charlton Campus
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Gerard Galvin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Galvin (CPSO#: 107016 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GERARD GALVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALVIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GERARD GALVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALVIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015