THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:06:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 402
65 Larch Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7056745030
Fax: 7056713147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamal Hilal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hilal (CPSO#: 107017 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(866) 469-0822
Business Address: Suites 103 and 402
65 Larch Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1B8
(888) 277-5188
Business Address: 865 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
(705) 523-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 402
65 Larch Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7056745030
Fax: 7056713147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamal Hilal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hilal (CPSO#: 107017 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(866) 469-0822
Business Address: Suites 103 and 402
65 Larch Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1B8
(888) 277-5188
Business Address: 865 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
(705) 523-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMAL MONZER HILAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMAL MONZER HILAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015