THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:58:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Michigan State University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 570 University Ave E
Unit 2
Waterloo Ontario N2K 4P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197464344
Fax: (519) 746-3334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahomed Rayhaan Dawood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dawood (CPSO#: 107027 )
Business Address: Unit 2
570 University Avenue East
Waterloo Ontario N2K 4P2
(519) 570-1280

Corporation Name: M. Dawood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dawood (CPSO#: 107027 ) Dr. M. Dawood (CPSO#: 74142 )
Business Address: Suite 902
570 University Avenue East
Waterloo Ontario N2K 4P2
(519) 570-1280

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Michigan State University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 570 University Ave E
Unit 2
Waterloo Ontario N2K 4P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197464344
Fax: (519) 746-3334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahomed Rayhaan Dawood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dawood (CPSO#: 107027 )
Business Address: Unit 2
570 University Avenue East
Waterloo Ontario N2K 4P2
(519) 570-1280

Corporation Name: M. Dawood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dawood (CPSO#: 107027 ) Dr. M. Dawood (CPSO#: 74142 )
Business Address: Suite 902
570 University Avenue East
Waterloo Ontario N2K 4P2
(519) 570-1280

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHOMED RAYHAAN DAWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWOOD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHOMED RAYHAAN DAWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWOOD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Michigan State University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015