THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:56:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stouffville Medical Centre
2nd Floor
34 Civic Ave
Stouffville Ontario L4A 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056403100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pearl Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Yang (CPSO#: 107042 )
Business Address: Stouffville Medical Centre
2-34 Civic Avenue
Stouffville Ontario L4A 1H2
(905) 640-3100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stouffville Medical Centre
2nd Floor
34 Civic Ave
Stouffville Ontario L4A 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056403100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pearl Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Yang (CPSO#: 107042 )
Business Address: Stouffville Medical Centre
2-34 Civic Avenue
Stouffville Ontario L4A 1H2
(905) 640-3100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PEARL MING YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PEARL MING YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015