THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:35:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7052419366
Fax: 7059150530

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Isaac Ryan Perlus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Perlus (CPSO#: 107050 )
Business Address: 303-1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7052419366
Fax: 7059150530

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Isaac Ryan Perlus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Perlus (CPSO#: 107050 )
Business Address: 303-1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISAAC RYAN PERLUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERLUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISAAC RYAN PERLUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERLUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015